HI HB841 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB841
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows any selection committee that evaluates an engineering, architectural, surveying, or landscape architectural professional service submittal for a state or county contract to require the top ranked competing professional service offerors to submit cost or pricing data on their respective proposals. Specifies that a purchasing agency is not required to disclose competing cost or pricing data to any party.
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in conference room Vis Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-21 10:00AM. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB841 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=841&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB841_.HTM |