HI HB840 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
When residential real property lies within the shoreline area, mandates the seller to include in the disclosure statement notification of all existing permitted and unpermitted erosion control structures on the parcel or on state land adjacent to the parcel, the annual coastal erosion rate, and the actual distance of the dwelling from the vegetation line for all sandy shoreline parcels.
Title
Relating To Real Estate Transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB840 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL, CPC, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Erosion Control Structures
Mandatory Seller Disclosures
Residential Real Property Transactions
Shoreline Area
Mandatory Seller Disclosures
Residential Real Property Transactions
Shoreline Area
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=840&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB840_.HTM |