HI HB839 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB839
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation or an eligible developer to prepare an environmental impact statement for any proposed housing project on lands zoned as preservation or conservation by the applicable county.
Title
Relating To Proposed Housing Developments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB839 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB644 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB644 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=839&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB839_.HTM |