HI HB835 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:15AM; CR 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:15AM; CR 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to support the ongoing operations of the Hawaii national guard youth challenge program. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The National Guard Youth Challenge Academy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:15AM; CR 229. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ganaden, McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; English. |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 631) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, English, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 603) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to CMV, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB835 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-21 10:15AM; CR 229.