HI HB831 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes term limits of not more than the lesser of three terms or twelve years for members of the board of trustees, office of Hawaiian affairs.
Title
Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB730 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB831 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6
HB831 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to WLH, JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=831&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB831_.HTM |