HI HB830 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB830

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Education to meet with Hawaii School for the Deaf and Blind stakeholders and members of the Hawaii deaf community regarding the development of a plan to transition the Hawaii School for the Deaf and Blind to a conversion charter school. Requires a report to the Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii School For The Deaf And Blind.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseThe committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:15PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB830 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB605 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to EDU, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback