HI HB830 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB830
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the county distribution of revenues collected from the transient accommodations tax. (HB830 HD1)
Title
Relating To Local Government.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 178) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TRN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Ohno, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 429. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to TOU, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB830 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).