HI HB829 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB829
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Agriculture to establish a five-year food hub pilot program to increase access to local food. Provides for the award of grant funding to qualified applicants wishing to establish or expand a food hub. Requires reports to the Legislature. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To A Food Hub Pilot Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB338 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
SB338 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=829&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB829_.HTM |