HI HB824 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB824
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Office of the Governor to award the Aloha Order of Merit to highly accomplished honorees who have provided extraordinary service to the State.
Title
Relating To The Aloha Order Of Merit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB824 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=824&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB824_.HTM |