HI HB823 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Act 022, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the scope of reports on correctional facility and community correctional center deaths that are submitted to the governor and legislature. Requires certain reports to be published on the department of corrections and rehabilitation website. Mandates public access to other information reported. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Deaths Within The Correctional System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-20SenateAct 022, 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
2023-04-19HouseAct 022, on 04/19/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
2023-04-05HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2023-04-05HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 656).
2023-04-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2023-04-04SenateOne Day Notice 04-05-23.
2023-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2023-03-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-24-23 9:40AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
2023-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2023-03-20SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1202) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2023-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
2023-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-03-10SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2023-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 346).
2023-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
2023-03-03HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-02-28HouseThe committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
2023-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
2023-02-13HouseReported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2023-02-08HouseThe committee on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Chun, Ganaden, Ichiyama, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 3
2023-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB456 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to PSM, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback