HI HB818 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB818
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance policies and contracts issued on or after 01/01/2024 to provide coverage for the cost of hearing aids at a minimum of $1,500 per hearing aid for each hearing-impaired ear every thirty-six months. Effective 01/01/2024.
Title
Relating To Hearing Aids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB818 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB609 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
SB609 (Same As) 2023-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=818&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB818_.HTM |