HI HB808 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to WLH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - (S) Referred to WLH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily suspends the distribution of a portion of the conveyance tax to the land conservation fund. Effective June 30, 2011. (HB808 HD1)
Title
Conveyance Tax; Land Conservation Fund Distribution Suspension
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 170). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Belatti, Hanohano, Morita, Nakashima voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Brower, Ching, C. Lee, Riviere, Takumi, Thielen, Wooley voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 666) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Yamashita, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-25-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 20 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |