HI HB807 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Act 114, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the misdemeanor offense of unsworn falsification to authorities to include knowingly making a false statement to a state investigator or county inspector in certain circumstances. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Offenses Against Public Administration.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateAct 114, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
2019-06-25HouseAct 114, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1216).
2019-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-26SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 871).
2019-04-25HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Thielen excused (2).
2019-04-25HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 860).
2019-04-24HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19.
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 857).
2019-04-23HouseHouse Conferee(s) discharged.
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Gabbard, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-09SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 638).
2019-04-05HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-04HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 657) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1737) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 410).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Thielen.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-05HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback