HI HB793 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB793
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of polystyrene foam containers and serving of prepared foods using polystyrene foam containers statewide. Authorizes the Department of Health to adopt rules to implement the prohibition and include within its administrative rules a requirement for food vendors to educate their customers about proper disposal of nonreusable food containers and litter reduction.
Title
Relating To Polystyrene Foam Containers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB793 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - Re-referred to EEP, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 7
Subjects
Disposal of Nonreusable Prepared Food Containers
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition
Litter Reduction
Polystyrene Foam Products
Prohibition
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=793&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB793_.HTM |