HI HB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 227, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 227, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an affordable homeownership revolving fund within HHFDC to provide loans to nonprofit community development financial institutions and nonprofit housing development organizations for the development of affordable homeownership housing projects. Appropriates American Rescue Plan Act funds for fiscal year 2022-2023 for providing loans to nonprofit community development financial institutions and nonprofit housing development organizations for the development of affordable homeownership housing projects. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 227, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355). |
2021-07-07 | House | Act 227, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1355). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 158). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Moriwaki, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Nishimoto, Hashimoto, Takumi, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 3:40PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-20-21 3:31PM in conference room CR 329. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakamura, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Takumi, McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 791). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chang Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Kanuha. |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 622) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1538) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1099) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 1:15PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 29). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 690), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 487) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-16-21 10:30AM in conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-16-21 at 10:30 AM in room 423. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-09-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Affordable Homeownership Revolving Fund
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing
American Rescue Plan Act of 2021
Appropriation ($)
HHFDC
Housing