HI HB79 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals, terminates, or closes certain revolving and trust funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Revolving and Trust Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-11 3:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 3:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-26 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-11 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-11 2:00PM in conference room 309. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Espero, Fukunaga, Kidani, Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: M. Oshiro Chair; Chong, Choy, M. Lee, Ward. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 385). | |
2011-04-05 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 389) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-04-04 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-04-11. | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-03-31 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 990) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga, Ryan. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-23-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee on WAM has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 43). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-26 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-28-11 5:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-15-11 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |