HI HB788 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB788
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the fifteen-year hale kokua project and hale kokua special fund under the department of human services with the aim of incentivizing homeowners to provide rental units to homeless persons. Amends the basis and rate of tax and disposition of the conveyance tax to support the hale kokua special fund. Effective 1/1/2022. Repeals on 7/1/2037.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB788 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=788&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB788_.HTM |