HI HB788 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the definition of "new hire" to the requirements for new hire reporting.
Title
Child Support Enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 109). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 639), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Ito, Wooley, McDermott. |
2013-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-21-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Coffman, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, Ward excused (6). |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 524), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-14-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to JDL.