HI HB781 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Auditor to perform a financial and management audit of the Department of Education, Superintendent, Board of Education, and complex areas every three years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB856 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback