HI HB78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB78
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Auditor to conduct a comprehensive management audit of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs' Division of Consumer Advocacy.
Title
Relating To The Division Of Consumer Advocacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB78 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=78&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB78_.HTM |