HI HB778 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes dwelling units on privately owned agricultural land with soils of overall productivity rating classes C, D, or E, subject to certain conditions. Allows the counties to prohibit such dwelling units or to limit such dwelling units to certain areas of the county. (HB778 HD2)
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-28 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-28-17 10:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) LoPresti, Thielen, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2017-02-10 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Gates, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing; 2 Noes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Thielen; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-10-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-02-03 | House | Re-referred to AGR, HSG, referral sheet 12 |
2017-02-03 | House | Recommitted to AGR as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and none excused. |
2017-02-03 | House | Recommends recommittal to AGR. |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 34) as amended in HD 1. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-01-17 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB778 (Carry Over) 2017-02-28 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.