HI HB777 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB777
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the uses and application of the transaction fee for filings in the Bureau of Conveyances authorized under Act 120, Session Laws of Hawaii 2009. Applies fee to all transactions in the Bureau and Land Court. Repeals the transaction fee upon adoption of rules by DLNR or July 1, 2022. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Recordation Transaction Fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 6). |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-13 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-18-20. |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 483), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:35PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2). |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD. |
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to WLH, CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 11 |
2019-02-01 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 02-01-19 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).