HI HB770 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 227, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Act 227, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes restaurants with a liquor license to sell beer, malt beverages, or cider for off-premises consumption, under certain conditions. Authorizes retail dealers with a liquor license to sell beer, malt beverages, or cider in non-original packages, under certain conditions. Authorizes brewpubs and small craft producer pubs with a liquor license to sell malt beverages manufactured on the premises or purchased from another liquor licensee for off-premises consumption. (SD1)
Title
Liquor Licenses; Restaurant; Retail Dealer; Brewpub; Small Craft Producer Pub
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Act 227, on 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336). |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Act 227, 07/13/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1336). |
2015-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 655). |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 651). |
2015-04-30 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-15. |
2015-04-28 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Luke, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-04-27 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-28-15 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 635). |
2015-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 672). |
2015-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Espero Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468). |
2015-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 497) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-10-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to PSM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 967) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to PSM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Slom. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-15 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to CPN, PSM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 641), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-25-15 2:45PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 449) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Nakashima. |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15. |
2015-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-09-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1151 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30