HI HB763 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Executive Office on Aging and the city and county of Honolulu to establish a three-year intergenerational playground pilot program. Requires reports to the Legislature and the mayor of the city and county of Honolulu. Appropriates funds. Repeals on June 30, 2019. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Seniors; Executive Office on Aging; Intergenerational Playground; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 984) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 225). |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Takayama voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 867), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 456) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-18 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-18-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |