HI HB760 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB760

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the works of art special fund to be used for performing arts, under certain conditions. Includes posting of a recording of performing art as a form of public display. Defines performing arts. Effective 7/1/2065. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-04SenateReferred to LCA, WAM.
2021-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 15).
2021-02-24HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ganaden, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-02-24HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 662), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none.
2021-02-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti, Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Har, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Kapela; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-27HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-25HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB928 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB760 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Referred to LCA, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback