HI HB760 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the State's automatic deduction of the gross proceeds of a county's surcharge on state tax for mass transit to three per cent to reimburse the State for costs associated with handling of the county surcharge on state tax. Requires an annual report of the usage of surcharge accounts.
Title
General Excise Tax; Surcharge; State Reimbursement
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-04 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-04-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=760&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB760_.HTM |