HI HB759 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an employment and training program under the department of human services for intellectually and developmentally disabled persons using medicaid waiver funds. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Developmental Disability; Job Training; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-10-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=759 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB759_.HTM |