HI HB757 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB757

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL/EEP, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes within the Department of Land and Natural Resources a Water Security Working Group to study and recommend priority capital improvement projects for legislative consideration and approval that leverage public-private investment to increase Hawaii's water security. Makes an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fresh Water Security.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-30HouseReferred to WAL/EEP, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB757 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Referred to WAL/EEP, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
SB1066 (Same As) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback