HI HB756 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 207, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 207, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOT, after consultation with the counties, to adopt rules prescribing uniform standards and specifications for all official traffic control devices placed pursuant to the Statewide Traffic Code. Specifies the factors the DOT and the counties must take into account when setting maximum speed limits on a road. (HB756 CD1)
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 207, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 207, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 57). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 57) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, K. Rhoads, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, C. Lee, Hashimoto, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-23 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953). |
2019-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-19 10:40AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Harimoto, Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Aquino, C. Lee Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Say, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 779) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:10AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Shimabukuro. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 220). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1008), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Say, Yamane. |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-27-19. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 292) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Speed Limits
Statewide Traffic Code
Traffic Control Devices
Uniform Standards and Specifications
Speed Limits
Statewide Traffic Code
Traffic Control Devices
Uniform Standards and Specifications