HI HB754 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB754

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the department of land and natural resources' state historic preservation division for a library digitization process and for the division's operations. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The State Historic Preservation Division.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
2023-02-09HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 212) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-02-02HouseThe committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-02-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-30HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
2023-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB754 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
SB1031 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to WTL, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback