HI HB744 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - (S) Recommitted to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - (S) Recommitted to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain dams and related reservoirs designated as important agricultural lands shall be included in the total area calculation for important agricultural lands. Establishes a dam safety task force to recommend safety actions. Effective 7/1/2030. (SD1)
Title
Dam Safety; Dam Safety Task Force; Incentives
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | (S) Recommitted to WAM. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1188) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English. | |
2011-03-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Tokuda; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 03-22-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to WLH, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 153). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Ching, C. Lee, McKelvey, Saiki, Takumi excused (6). | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Ward. | |
2011-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-15-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 15 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |