HI HB740 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a domestic violence task force to make recommendations to address domestic violence in Hawaii and then report to the legislature. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB740 HD1)
Title
Domestic Violence; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 7) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-01-27 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: C. Lee, Yamane, Ching. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-27-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |