HI HB74 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to WAL, AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Disallows the enforcement of a re-recorded homeowners' association restriction if the restriction prohibits bona fide agricultural uses and activities on agricultural land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Restrictions On Agricultural Uses And Activities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, AGR, CPC, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB186 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 81).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback