HI HB74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows qualified individuals to secure transfer of a vehicle's certificate of vehicle registration and certificate of ownership upon the death of the registered owner or legal owner of a registered motor vehicle without going through probate.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-29 | House | Re-referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB74 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=74&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB74_.HTM |