HI HB74 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces a requirement that the speaker of the house of representatives and the president of the senate must jointly request legal representation for a legislative office before that respective house may receive legal representation with a requirement that allows either the speaker's request or the senate president's request, as appropriate, to constitute a sufficient request. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Employment Of Attorneys.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 376). |
2017-03-28 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 392) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) Galuteria, Kim, Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-24-17. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 978) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 8). |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB74 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).