HI HB737 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB737
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excepts direct import vehicles, i.e. vehicles at least 25 years old, from the requirement that vehicles be in compliance with all Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standards to be registered. Defines "direct import vehicle."
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB737 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=737&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB737_.HTM |