HI HB729 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the campaign spending commission to publish on its website the names of candidate committees and noncandidate committees who fail to properly file an organizational report.
Title
Relating To Candidate Committee And Noncandidate Committee Organizational Reports.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-23-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Candidate Committees
Commission to Improve Standards of Conduct
Noncandidate Committees
Organizational Reports
Commission to Improve Standards of Conduct
Noncandidate Committees
Organizational Reports
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=729&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB729_.HTM |