HI HB728 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB728
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires student transportation costs for charter school students to be included in the department of budget and finance's annual budget request rather than including it in the per-pupil funding amount.
Title
Relating To Charter Schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB728 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
SB939 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB939 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Charter Schools
Department of Budget and Finance Annual Budget
Per-pupil Funding Requests
Student Transportation Costs
Department of Budget and Finance Annual Budget
Per-pupil Funding Requests
Student Transportation Costs
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=728&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB728_.HTM |