HI HB72 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows microgrid owners and operators to file for a certificate of public convenience and necessity.
Title
Relating To Microgrid Certificates Of Public Convenience And Necessity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB72 (Carry Over) 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=72&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB72_.HTM |