HI HB718 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB718

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes ranked choice voting for special federal elections and special elections of vacant county council seats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Ranked Choice Voting.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB427 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB718 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback