HI HB718 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services to develop and administer a program assisting former foster youth with housing options. Appropriates funds. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Former Foster Youth; Housing; Appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-03-23 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 850) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-03-17 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-18-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-03-14 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 151). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 907), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chong, Nakashima excused (2). | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, Morikawa, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Belatti, C. Lee, Wooley. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-10-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |