HI HB716 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the importation of dangerous wild animals for exhibition in a circus, carnival, or other live animal act or performance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Wild Animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-08-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-24HouseReferred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 5
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback