HI HB700 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB700
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the state fuel tax for the period of July 1, 2023, to June 30, 2024. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Fuel Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 467) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-10 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2023-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-10-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB700 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0).