HI HB692 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB692
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to offer training for teachers, educational officers, and school-based behavioral health specialists on sex trafficking prevention and response.
Title
Relating To Sex Trafficking Prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1347 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2).
HB692 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB692 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=692&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB692_.HTM |