HI HB687 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to regulate genetically engineered organisms and pesticide use to the extent that the regulations are more stringent than state or federal laws.
Title
County Authority; Genetically Engineered Organisms; Pesticide Use
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=687&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB687_.HTM |