HI HB687 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures adequate and appropriate health care services for Hawaii's veterans receiving health care services at the Yukio Okutsu state veterans home by providing the department of defense, office of veterans services with greater access and input into the veterans home's operations. (HB687 HD2)
Title
Office of Veterans' Services; Yukio Okutsu State Veterans Home
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, McKelvey, Takai, Takumi, Tokioka excused. | |
2009-02-19 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2009-02-17 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: McKelvey, Choy, Berg, Manahan, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wakai, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Evans. | |
2009-02-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EBM on Tuesday, 02-17-09 8:30am in House conference room 312. | |
2009-02-06 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EBM with none voting no (0) and Takai, Takumi, Wakai excused (3). | |
2009-02-05 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EBM. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro, Finnegan; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-30-09 8:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to HLT, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |