HI HB686 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the offense of criminal trespass on critical electrical infrastructure and makes it a class C felony. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Critical Electrical Infrastructure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Gates, Hashimoto, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela; and Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HET on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback