HI HB685 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB685
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the direct sale of raw milk and raw milk products to consumers, with certain restrictions. Specifies labeling requirements for raw milk and raw milk products.
Title
Relating To Raw Milk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB685 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=685&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB685_.HTM |