HI HB682 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB682

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a task force in the department of taxation to discuss the need to rebalance and repurpose the tax programs created by the general excise tax, income tax, and property tax laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-02HouseRe-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 4
2021-01-27HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB682 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 4

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback