HI HB681 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes linked investments to provide loan funds for agriculture and authorizes the director of finance to commit no more than $5,000,000 in certain available moneys for the creation of linked investments through agreements with eligible lending institutions. Appropriates funds to the department of budget and finance to hire one position to administer the linked investment program. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Management Of State Funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 527) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Sayama, Okimoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Onishi; and Excused: none.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-08HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
2021-02-03HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to AGR, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback